contents:
multiplication calculator:

This calculator was designed for relatively simple multiplication problems. Decimals are accepted, but adding negative numbers will produce flawed work, despite a correct answer.
× = 0
» Show Work
Enter problem to view work.



basic explanation:

Multiplication is a mathematical operation that makes one number have that many groups as another number. For example, when you multiply 7 by 8, what you are really doing is making 7 groups of 8, and adding the result. So, 7 x 8 is equivalent to 7+7+7+7+7+7+7+7. The answer to a multiplication problem is known as the product. The product is found by adding all the groups together.
Multiplication if often signified by either the multiplication sign (×) or the asterisk (*). It is also often referred to as "times". For example, 7 times 7 = 49.


in-depth explanation:

There are numerous ways to solve multiplication problems, but arguably the most sufficient way is through long multiplication. This is the way the steps for the multiplication calculator are shown. To prepare for long multiplication, you must line the numbers up so the last digit of each number are lined up. If you're adding numbers with decimals, add the approipriate number of 0's so the numbers have the same amount of digits after the decimal character (.), and then perform the preparation step. Next, multiply the right-most bottom digit by the right-most top digit. If the answer is greater than or equal to 10, you must carry the first digit of the product to the digit one to the left of the multiplied top digit. Otherwise, simply place the product of the digits below the line. Next, move the top digit being multiplied one to the left. Keep in mind that the bottom digit being multiplied doesn't change every time the top-most digit does. Continue these steps until you are on the last top-most digit. Once this point is reached, the process is nearly the same. However, if multiplying the digits results in a product greater than or equal to 10, instead of carrying the first digit of the product, you place the product below the line.
After you've multiplied every top digit by the right-most bottom digit, you move the bottom digit being multiplied one to the left, and then repeat the process. Before doing any multiplication, however, you must first start a new line below your previous workspace that you must place x amount of 0's on, where x is the number of times you've moved the bottom digit being multiplied to the left. Continue the preceding process until you are out of bottom digits. Once you reach that point, you must add the numbers on each line together, which will result in the product.

practice problems:

To fully understand this concept, it is important to utilize your knowledge through problems. Rather than creating your own, you can simply use some of the ones from our collection of multiplication problems below. They are categorized into three different categories: easy, medium, and hard. It is recommended you begin with the easy problems and work your way up from there. If you are having difficulties solving any of the problems, you may use our multiplication calculator which will calculate the answer and provide steps on how the problem was solved. You may also use the calculator to check you got the correct answer.

        easy:

1.) 4 × 3 = ?
2.) 5 × 4 = ?
3.) 1 × 9 = ?
4.) 4 × 8 = ?
5.) 2 × 9 = ?
6.) 9 × 4 = ?
7.) 5 × 3 = ?
8.) 9 × 5 = ?
9.) 10 × 8 = ?
10.) 3 × 7 = ?


        medium:

1.) 32 × 12 = ?
2.) 59 × 54 = ?
3.) 34 × 39 = ?
4.) 32 × 94 = ?
5.) 85 × 23 = ?
6.) 58 × 82 = ?
7.) 95 × 48 = ?
8.) 63 × 81 = ?
9.) 28 × 99 = ?
10.) 58 × 23 = ?

        hard:

1.) 585 × 238 = ?
2.) 495 × 384 = ?
3.) 199 × 858 = ?
4.) 348 × 991 = ?
5.) 548 × 653 = ?
6.) 732 × 848 = ?
7.) 248 × 211 = ?
8.) 949 × 828 = ?
9.) 885 × 541 = ?
10.) 113 × 449 = ?
picture
Social Network Pages: picturefollow us on twitter